Dogfen lywodraethu CITIZENS ADVICE SHROPSHIRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 NOV 2017 as amended on 28 Nov 2023 as amended on 28 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN SHROPSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
SHROPSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.