BLIND SAILING

Charity number: 1090712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £23.32k £36.88k £24.86k £27.93k £13.16k
Total expenditure £16.53k £39.99k £20.73k £29.97k £9.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A