Accounts and annual returns KINGSGATE CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1087562
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 April 2025 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 August 2024 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 April 2025 440 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window