Trustees CARERS FIRST
Charity number: 1085430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Adrian Davis | Chair | 19 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Semantha Neal | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Manir Hussain | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roberta Camilla Heys | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Bertram Sparrow | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Jayne Botting | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Jayne Wells | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Marion Isabel Hoare | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alan Jenkins | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Shaw | Trustee | 02 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sukwinder Bassi | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.