BEENSTOCK HOME MANAGEMENT CO. LTD

Charity number: 1087224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £998.68k £1.44m £1.35m £1.44m £1.51m
Total expenditure £1.09m £1.24m £1.32m £1.39m £1.56m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £266.10k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £43.78k £284.01k £59.47k £44.23k £124.39k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £202.18k £1.16m £1.29m £1.39m £1.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £2 £44 £32 £15
Income - Other £752.73k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £65.68k £1.23m £1.32m £1.39m £1.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £65.68k £8.10k £4.49k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.02m £8.10k £0 £0 £0