ALTERNATIVES TO VIOLENCE PROJECT, BRITAIN

Charity number: 1085709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 November 2016 On time Download