NOOR TRUST

Charity number: 1089506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 22 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 29 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download