NOOR TRUST

Charity number: 1089506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £1.50m £1.72m £1.98m £1.64m £1.18m
Total expenditure £1.36m £1.47m £1.78m £1.34m £1.25m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £947.84k £1.05m £1.64m £538.93k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £640.75k
Income - Charitable activities £1.50m £768.54k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.41k
Income - Other £350 £217 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.36m £1.35m £1.45m £1.34m £1.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £120.72k £132.58k £90.24k £54.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £120.72k £331.36k £0 £0