Cambridge Castle Townswomen's Guild

Charity number: 1085276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £8.10k £6.25k £6.55k £9.58k £5.00k
Total expenditure £7.74k £5.86k £6.66k £7.34k £4.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A