THE ENTHUSIASM TRUST

Charity number: 1087438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £714.26k £445.41k £383.94k £553.89k £463.96k
Total expenditure £733.68k £683.57k £520.69k £411.03k £408.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £95.80k £3.91k N/A £1.18k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £202.06k £247.20k £135.63k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.12k N/A N/A £523.42k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £397.94k N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £304.68k N/A N/A £30.47k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.51k N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £720.19k N/A N/A £411.03k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £216 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £13.28k N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A