Financial history THE URY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1087527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.73k £0 £20.00k £5.00k £10.00k
Total expenditure £13.71k £7.00k £14.19k £12.41k £8.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A