Governing document THE PRINCETHORPE FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/06/2014 as amended on 25 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH CONDUCT AND CARRY ON AN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL, COLLEGE AND NURSERY OR ANY ONE OF MORE THEREOF, AT WHICH EDUCATION IS PROVIDED IN ACCORDANCE WITH ARTICLE 5, FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF ALL OR NO RELIGIOUS DENOMINATIONS AND OF SUCH AGES AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE FOUNDATION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.