Accounts and annual returns BASINGSTOKE- OLD BASING U3A

Charity number: 1086263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 23 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 05 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 27 April 2022 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 13 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 13 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window