Financial history RIVERHEAD INFANTS' SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1086548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 28/02/2021
Total gross income £40.51k £44.64k £34.05k £37.58k £43.82k
Total expenditure £17.17k £20.85k £17.41k £11.47k £66.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A