ROSLYN FLORENCE HARDING

Charity number: 1087005
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £57.48k £61.88k £59.00k £55.26k £56.75k
Total expenditure £58.66k £61.63k £53.14k £59.73k £58.40k