Financial history ST CATHERINES HILL COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1088266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £29.67k £27.84k £28.05k £27.69k £9.72k
Total expenditure £26.86k £25.35k £19.05k £33.63k £15.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A