Trustees COLCHESTER STANWAY AFTERNOON TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
Charity number: 1086246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Tokley | Chair | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deanna Roberts | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Hawkins | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bland | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kay Brown | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia de Burca | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Edwards | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joan Stubbs | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Doris Judge | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Gray | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Diane Stannard | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ann Booty | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.