Financial history Age UK West Sussex, Brighton & Hove

Charity number: 1086323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.66m £2.23m £2.91m £4.61m £3.82m
Total expenditure £2.34m £2.46m £2.49m £3.12m £3.71m
Income from government contracts £1.26m £1.25m £1.22m £777.11k £2.28m
Income from government grants £90.24k £90.85k £98.47k £2.08m £78.61k
Income - Donations and legacies £355.68k £118.35k £609.11k £1.68m £825.89k
Income - Other trading activities £124.01k £107.95k £88.55k £75.59k £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.18m £2.01m £2.21m £2.85m £2.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £591 £274 £924 £1.74k £1.49k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.75k £0
Income - Legacies £293.64k £69.86k £537.07k £15.55k £45.75k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.28m £2.41m £2.44m £3.04m £3.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £57.84k £57.05k £56.22k £79.74k £20.09k
Expenditure - Governance £6.72k £6.04k £6.86k £18.92k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £17.31k £70.94k £70.94k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0