Accounts and annual returns THURROCK ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1088656
Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 13 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 13 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 March 2024 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 March 2024 272 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 02 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 June 2022 337 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 June 2022 337 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 June 2022 702 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 June 2022 702 days late Download Open in new window