Financial history EAST KENT FEDERATION OF TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILDS

Charity number: 1086473
Charity reporting is overdue by 70 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £2.94k £1.77k £2.94k £2.43k £1.22k
Total expenditure £2.70k £1.76k £2.53k £2.60k £812
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A