Financial history 17TH NORWICH (ST GEORGE'S RC) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1086590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £28.11k £22.16k £22.78k £32.45k £8.57k
Total expenditure £25.63k £25.84k £22.39k £28.43k £6.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A