MERCY MISSION WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1088750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time Download