Accounts and annual returns MUSIC FOR LIFE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1090556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window