RAMSGATE OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1091538
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £40.17k £43.51k £18.44k £18.09k £10.39k
Total expenditure £19.64k £34.06k £22.89k £32.89k £16.41k