CMZ LTD

Charity number: 1087870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 February 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download