VALGRAY'S BORDER COLLIE AND ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1088503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 May 2017 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 May 2017 103 days late Download