Accounts and annual returns HOPE HOUSE SCHOOL, BARNSLEY

Charity number: 1088526
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022
Annual return 31 August 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021
Annual return 31 August 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020
Annual return 31 August 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019
Annual return 31 August 2018
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018