COALEY VILLAGE PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1088208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £30.09k £42.53k £46.84k £55.90k £43.59k
Total expenditure £29.44k £42.78k £45.69k £54.55k £39.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.00k