SAFEWARD LIMITED

Charity number: 1088948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.55m £0 £629.34k £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.45m £812.27k £1.32m £496.21k £65.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £428.32k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £267.25k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £279 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £2.86m N/A £629.34k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £353.53k N/A £1.32m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.90k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £19.08k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £353.53k N/A £1.30m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £3.90k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £1.09m N/A £0 N/A N/A