GRUNDY PARK (KING GEORGE'S FIELD) CHESHUNT

Charity number: 1087654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 August 2021 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 August 2021 557 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 August 2021 922 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 August 2021 1287 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required