Trustees ST ALBANS CITY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity number: 1089343

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAM MARDLE | Chair | 05 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Hester Hearn | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anthony Robinson | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BAKER | Trustee | 27 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Sarah Kropman | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Hancock | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Watts | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE LEVY | Trustee | 31 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GEORGE PYKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN WOODS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.