Financial history BARRASFORD PLAYGROUND COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1091735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £17.64k £0 £0 £211 £226
Total expenditure £17.75k £100 £103 £525 £555
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.64k N/A N/A N/A N/A