BIRMINGHAM MONTSERRAT DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1093539
Charity reporting is overdue by 1821 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 360 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 360 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 726 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 726 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1091 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1091 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1456 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1456 days
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1821 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1821 days