HELMSLEY ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1089682
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2018 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required