Financial history ST BARTHOLOMEWS SCHOOL CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 1090843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.49k £3.65k £24.86k £13.22k £21.35k
Total expenditure £14.18k £1.14k £11.65k £7.54k £12.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A