Financial history WARLEY WOODS COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1092754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £290.40k £313.77k £292.59k £446.20k £468.42k
Total expenditure £296.81k £309.13k £298.93k £340.35k £303.68k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £73.31k £71.77k £75.39k £72.49k £146.81k