Trustees WARLEY WOODS COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1092754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEVEN CHARLES ELING Chair
None on record
Clive Ernest Heywood Trustee 15 October 2022
None on record
Lynda Tracy Wagstaff Trustee 16 October 2021
None on record
John Paul Newman Trustee 17 October 2020
None on record
Lisa Burrows Trustee 26 October 2019
None on record
Michael James Talbot Trustee 26 October 2019
None on record
Patricia Ann Marsh Trustee 21 October 2017
None on record
DAVID JOHN READ Trustee 10 October 2015
BIRMINGHAM HOSPITAL SATURDAY FUND MEDICAL CHARITY AND WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
Christopher Neil Ashford Trustee 10 October 2015
None on record
Barbara Ann Platts Trustee 29 October 2013
None on record
ALAN DAVID REYNOLDS Trustee
None on record
KATHERINE MARY SLADE Trustee
None on record
ARTHUR ROBERT WARD Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH COLEMAN Trustee
None on record