Trustees RUGBY UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1094479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Mary Fassam | Chair | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jennette Vowles | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jean Linnett | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Ann Marchant | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Lillian Fowler | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marie Daniel | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Russell Day | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Radesk | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Daniel | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Miles | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.