STRATFORD-UPON-AVON TOWN TRUST

Charity number: 1088521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.82m £1.94m £2.08m £2.01m £3.60m
Total expenditure £1.76m £1.71m £1.79m £2.02m £3.49m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.56m £1.70m £1.84m £1.74m £7.71k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £446 £464 £293 £817 £7.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £77.73k £71.36k £72.78k £95.16k £3.58m
Income - Other £180.41k £169.19k £168.01k £173.35k £9.15k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.41m £1.44m £1.55m £1.78m £2.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £275.71k £238.24k £233.21k £1.10m
Expenditure - Governance £150.16k £130.94k £123.81k £133.66k £60.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.12m £1.14m £954.41k £1.74m
Expenditure - Investment management £24.84k £20.20k £3.32k £800 £870.14k
Expenditure - Other £174.93k £0 £0 £0 £0