Trustees THE OAKLEA TRUST

Charity number: 1091722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Derek Ridgway Trustee 03 May 2023
THE TOC H ALISON HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
MERCIA MS THERAPY CENTRE LTD
Received: 8 days late
SOUTH LAKES U3A
Overdue by 74 days
THE KENT ESTUARY YOUTH PROJECT (KEY)
Received: On time
THE LUNE RIVERS TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Robin Jeremy Talbot Trustee 03 May 2023
None on record
Colin Mitchell Trustee 03 May 2023
None on record
Dr Philip Henry Smith MBE Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record
Michael Andrew Scott Trustee 06 November 2019
None on record
Maxine Lorraine Denoual Trustee 06 November 2019
None on record
SUSAN FLORENCE O'HALLORAN Trustee 16 January 2018
LUPTON TOWER TRUST
Received: On time
Linda Adey Trustee 08 November 2017
None on record
Christopher Harris Trustee 08 November 2017
None on record