THE FRIENDS OF ST JOSEPH'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1088786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 July 2021 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 July 2021 737 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 November 2017 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required