THE FRIENDS OF ST JOSEPH'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1088786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.08k £1.11k £900 £0 £74
Total expenditure £2.78k £1.39k £1.10k £0 £574
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A