Dogfen lywodraethu CITIZENS ADVICE CENTRAL DORSET LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 MAR 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 APR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 AUG 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 MAR 2019 as amended on 12 Mar 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
DORCHESTER, SHERBORNE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.