THE HON A G SAMUEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1090481
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £20.00k £20.00k £20.03k £20.00k £20.00k
Total expenditure £24.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.50k £22.50k