HILTINGBURY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1089482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 April 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 23 April 2016 On time Download