Accounts and annual returns THE COLOSSI TRUST

Charity number: 1091634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 April 2021 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 09 April 2021 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 05 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 03 December 2020 302 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 March 2018 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 03 April 2018 57 days late Download Open in new window