Trustees THE STAFF AND EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1089537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Helen Louise King | Chair | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Erika Corradini | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Stephen John Powell | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Charles Alan Buckley | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Jennie Winter | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mx Rachel Karensa Rusu | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
William McGuire | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Mary Marcella Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Gemma Mansi | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Clare Elaine Saunders | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Joanna Gaye Aylin | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Giles David Rustom Martin | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Victoria Elizabeth Davies | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Clare Hilary Power | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr PAMELA MARY PARKER | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Bilton | Trustee | 07 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MAURICE LEWIS TEASDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Prof. JAMES WISDOM | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Gina Wisker | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.