BENGALI COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1093546
Charity reporting is overdue by 1692 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 30/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £5.07k £4.67k £3.56k £3.56k £3.47k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £132 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A