Financial history COMMUNITY ACTION BRADFORD & DISTRICT LTD.

Charity number: 1090036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £415.07k £1.45m £1.49m £1.29m £1.16m
Total expenditure £572.90k £1.46m £1.32m £1.25m £1.11m
Income from government contracts £0 £180.00k £180.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £122.21k £506.76k £379.80k £596.69k £655.93k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £726.39k £723.28k £610.05k £743.49k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £282.40k £315.47k £358.86k £342.55k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £443.02k £450.66k £314.18k £72.66k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £2.76k £3.14k £3.35k £5.26k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £38.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.23m £990.85k £993.84k £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £258.72k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £11.94k £7.77k £0 £9.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £233.02k £69.00k £254.08k £0