Accounts and annual returns MOULTON CHAPEL YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1095728
Charity reporting is overdue by 1669 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 208 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 208 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 25 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 09 March 2022 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 23 April 2021 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 23 April 2021 115 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 23 December 2020 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1669 days